Accounts and annual returns CHALFONT ST PETER CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL FUND
Charity Number: 1061990
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 22 October 2012 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | 22 October 2012 | 236 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 17 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 19 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window