Financial history CHALFONT ST PETER CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1061990
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 30/04/2011
Total gross income £144.64k £139.52k £130.05k £112.86k £105.78k
Total expenditure £146.54k £130.47k £118.65k £125.29k £113.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A