SLOUGH IMMIGRATION AID UNIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SIAU provides specialist legal advice, assistance and representation to people who live, work or study in Slough and neighbouring areas, and their families, who have difficulties with UK immigration, nationality or refugee law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Slough
Governance
- 09 September 1997: Standard registration
- 13 February 2019: Funds received from 1078847 SLOUGH VOLUNTEER BUREAU
- SIAU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE SHUTTER | Chair | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RAYMOND BARKLEY | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keren Beddow | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shabana Saeed | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nazia Shabir | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.84k | £41.81k | £34.14k | £37.93k | £52.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.96k | £33.13k | £37.99k | £44.37k | £43.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 AUGUST 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO LIVE OR WORK OR STUDY IN SLOUGH AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS, AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO HAVE DIFFICULTIES CAUSED BY IMMIGRATION, NATIONALITY OR REFUGEE LAW AND PRACTICE AND WHO CANNOT AFFORD ALTERNATIVE REPRESENTATION AND TO COLLABORATE WITH OTHERS TO IMPROVE SUCH ADVICE FOR THE PEOPLE OF SLOUGH 2. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND EDUCATION ON IMMIGRATION, NATIONALITY AND REFUGEE LAW TO THOSE WHO ARE MOST CLOSELY AFFECTED BY THEM, AND OTHERS
Area of benefit
SLOUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
SLOUGH IMMIGRATION AID UNIT
FIRST FLOOR
52 CHALVEY HIGH STREET
SLOUGH
SL1 2SQ
- Phone:
- 01753246730
- Email:
- info.siau@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window