Accounts and annual returns ST TUDY PLAYING FIELD TRUST
Charity number: 1061819
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 December 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 December 2021 | 400 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 December 2021 | 400 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 18 August 2020 | 200 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 18 January 2019 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window