THE FRIENDS OF ST CLARE'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christmas Market & Fayre. Key Stage 1 & 2 Discos Prom Night Quiz and Movie Night. Summer Fete Sports Day Refreshments Misc sales of merchandise and products
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 15 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Wyatt | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Rowe | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Agnieszka Brzezinska | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Marie Drane | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/07/2020 | 19/07/2021 | 19/07/2022 | 19/07/2023 | 19/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £644 | £7.39k | £12.78k | £7.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.03k | £1.14k | £4.97k | £13.61k | £4.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 July 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 July 2020 | 18 July 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Clares RC School
Cloes Lane
Clacton-on-Sea
CO16 8AG
- Phone:
- 01255425344
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window