Relationship Therapy North

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relationship counselling Sex Therapy Therapeutic counselling for young people Family counselling Education and learning Therapeutic support for adult survivors of childhood sexual abuse Telephone counselling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £82,339 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Lancashire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 May 1997: Standard registration
- Relate Cross Pennine (Previous name)
- Relate Cross Pennine (Previous name)
- RELATE KEIGHLEY AND CRAVEN (Previous name)
- RELATE PENNINE KEIGHLEY AND CRAVEN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ROYSTON PERRYMAN | Chair | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Craik | Trustee | 09 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Barbara Honey | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dickson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Adams | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wright | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rashda Kholwadia | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.20k | £326.57k | £304.66k | £343.89k | £362.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.59k | £306.17k | £326.11k | £335.71k | £320.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £102.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £145.14k | N/A | £82.34k | £82.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 9 DECEMBER 2008 as amended on 02 Apr 2021 as amended on 15 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE: 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: = 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; 4.5 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.6 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY DISTRICT, ILKLEY AND BINGLEY, CRAVEN DISTRICT, INCLUDING SKIPTON, SETTLE, GRASSINGTON, BENTHAM AND INGLETON AND THE DISTRICTS OF CALDERDALE AND KIRKLEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACRES HOUSE
BERRY LANE
KEIGHLEY
WEST YORKSHIRE
BD21 1DN
- Phone:
- 01535 605047
- Email:
- info@relatecp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window