PSAPPHA LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is the operation of a contemporary music ensemble.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £83,509 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 August 1997: Standard registration
- 12 December 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1194413 OLYMPIAS MUSIC FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.96k | £202.16k | £205.03k | £251.41k | £122.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.27k | £178.49k | £158.46k | £285.71k | £169.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £143.51k | £83.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PERFORMING, BROADCASTING, PUBLISHING EDUCATION WORK AND COMMISSIONING NEW WORK IN THE GENRE OF MUSIC THEATRE OF THE TWENTIETH CENTURY THAN CURRENT OF THE TIME OF THE COMMISSIONERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window