BALDOCK BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church and Sunday School adopting Baptist Confession of Faith 1689.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 19 November 1997: Standard registration
- SALEM (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN CHAPMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Nolan-Neylan | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Northern | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN EDWARD NORTHERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MARGARET NORTHERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA ANNE CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.05k | £124.57k | £133.32k | £148.99k | £88.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.38k | £49.09k | £44.99k | £60.78k | £85.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 November 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 November 2022 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JULY 1995, AS AMENDED 30 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL AND BY THE DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Arnolds Close
Clifton
SHEFFORD
Bedfordshire
SG175SZ
- Phone:
- 01462733207
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window