THE LOUGHBOROUGH WAR MEMORIAL MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The operation of a Museum in the Loughborough Carillon Tower War Memorial in memory of the men and women killed in defence of our Country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 June 1997: Standard registration
- LOUCHBOROUGH WAR MEMORIAL MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Melvyn GOULD | Chair | 28 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Cory-Lowsley | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dave Grenz | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steve Coltman | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harris | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
madeline Gibbard | Trustee | 09 April 2003 |
|
|
||||
Luke Smith | Trustee | 12 January 1996 |
|
|
||||
Keith Hassall | Trustee | 09 April 1989 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GIBBARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.27k | £3.09k | £4.80k | £3.07k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29k | £1.19k | £3.57k | £2.00k | £3.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE WHATEVER OF THE WARTIME MEMORABILIA AS MAY EXIST AND TO MAINTAIN A LOUGHBOROUGH MILITARY MUSEUM IN THE LOUGHBOROUGH WAR MEMORIAL CARILLON TOWER FOR THE BENEFIT OF LOUGHBOROUGH, LEICESTERSHIRE AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Area of benefit
LOUGHBOROUGH, LEICESTERSHIRE AND THE NATION AT LARGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loughborough Carillon Museum
c/o John Storer House
Wards End
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE11 3HA
- Phone:
- 01509230603
- Email:
- Carillonmuseum@gmail.com
- Website:
-
www,carillontower.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window