THE BRITISH ONCOLOGY PHARMACY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1065026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

BOPA promotes excellence in pharmaceutical care of British Cancer Patients

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £166,227
Total expenditure: £257,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BOPA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joseph Williams Trustee 09 February 2020
None on record
emma foreman Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Robert Duncombe Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £257.58k £71.72k £71.99k £161.53k £166.23k
Total expenditure £121.62k £166.14k £71.60k £124.05k £257.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 February 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 February 2024 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 March 2022 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GBH Ltd
Unit 7-8
Innovation Place
Douglas Drive
GODALMING
Surrey
Phone:
07885611995