Financial history HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 1062032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £207.97k £258.90k £204.80k £193.31k £156.83k
Total expenditure £197.95k £216.36k £192.67k £193.28k £175.09k
Income from government contracts £97.00k £97.00k £45.41k £44.58k N/A
Income from government grants £48.76k £45.17k £126.56k £115.69k £101.85k