Governing document HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/09/2011
Charitable objects
5.1.1 THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, AND 5.1.2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND OF POVERTY, IN EACH CASE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SPECIFICALLY, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION,, WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM, CENTRAL AND WEST LONDON, THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE. THIS SHALL INCLUDE (BUT SHALL NOT BE LIMITED TO) THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF VOLUNTEERING.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.