Financial history ANAH PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1064047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £236.40k £524.31k £432.73k £548.64k £395.75k
Total expenditure £304.02k £403.16k £421.76k £466.47k £470.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £62.85k N/A £136.07k £114.44k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £524.21k N/A £548.64k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £12.31k N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £403.16k N/A £466.47k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.90k N/A £12.12k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A