ANAH PROJECT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To work towards redressing the difficulties faced by BAME (Black, Asian and Minority Ethnic) women who have suffered mental and physical abuse through the provision of residential accommodation and to educate and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £114,436 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 20 August 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shazia Khan | Chair | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Peters | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucillia Julianna Grayston | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEILA SABRINA TALEB | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MIRIAM BENJAMIN | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MARGARET BAXTER | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.40k | £524.31k | £432.73k | £548.64k | £395.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.02k | £403.16k | £421.76k | £466.47k | £470.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £62.85k | N/A | £136.07k | £114.44k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £524.21k | N/A | £548.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £12.31k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £403.16k | N/A | £466.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.90k | N/A | £12.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AMONGST BLACK, ASIAN, MINORITY ETHNIC AND REFUGEE (BAMER) WOMEN WHO HAVE SUFFERED MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ABUSE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A. RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND CENTRE WHERE SUCH WOMEN CAN BE PROVIDED WITH PROTECTION AND SECURITY; B. ACCESS TO AN INFORMATION SERVICE AND LEGAL ADVICE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; C. OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP LIFE AND SOCIAL SKILLS AND ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; D. ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; E. REFERRALS TO SPECIALIST SERVICES UPON REQUIREMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX NO 548
BRADFORD
WEST YORKSHIRE
BD1 5YX
- Phone:
- 03001021625
- Email:
- admin@anahproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window