Accounts and annual returns CHELTENHAM BOURNSIDE SCHOOL AND SIXTH FORM CENTRE PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068981
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 August 2013 05 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2012 05 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2011 25 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2011 Not Required