Financial history CHELTENHAM BOURNSIDE SCHOOL AND SIXTH FORM CENTRE PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1068981
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2009 30/08/2010 30/08/2011 30/08/2012 30/08/2013
Total gross income £12.81k £10.68k £8.32k £4.59k £6.16k
Total expenditure £10.31k £17.45k £8.03k £2.03k £6.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A