HATHERSAGE C OF E SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN OUR SCHOOL. WE DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF AND PARENTS, AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. WE ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. WE PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OF ITEMS FOR EDUCATION NOT PROVIDED AT THE SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 26 June 1997: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 April 2014: Re-registered
- 07 December 2023: Funds received from 1045312 THE CLAIRE JOHN FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Bradbury | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDSEY PATRICIA GARNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £2.71k | £16.19k | £6.35k | £11.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £4.23k | £6.54k | £10.14k | £10.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL LANE
HATHERSAGE
HOPE VALLEY
S32 1BZ
- Phone:
- 01433650434
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window