Governing document SARCOIDOSISUK
Charity number: 1063986

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOV 1996 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAR 2017 as amended on 21 May 2018 as amended on 18 Jul 2019 as amended on 18 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM SARCOIDOSIS AND INTERSTITIAL LUNG CONDITION AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THESE CONDITIONS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GREATER LONDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.