Trustees SARCOIDOSISUK
Charity number: 1063986

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Jane Sturdy | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Dawn Mary Farrar | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dawn Clements | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Roma Aileen Armstrong | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Richardson | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Jean-Pierre Donald Etienne | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Susan Wilson | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Cordner | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Paul Sinclare | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.