TANZANEAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of deafness and deaf people in Tanzania, including promoting their welfare education employment and social integration. We support a school for deaf children in Dar es Salaam and an NGO run by young deaf people providing advocacy education skills training and family support to young deaf adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
- Tanzania
Governance
- 29 July 1997: Standard registration
- F O D O T (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE DEAF OF TANZANIA (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE DEAF OF TANZANIA (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corrine Collins | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Roberts | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MIDDLETON | Trustee | 11 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.48k | £34.45k | £23.07k | £26.05k | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.51k | £54.80k | £45.47k | £43.74k | £36.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 12TH JULY 1997 AND 12TH JULY 2008 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DEAF PEOPLE (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL INCLUDE PERSONS WHO ARE TOTALLY OR PROFOUNDLY DEAF OR WHO ARE PARTIALLY DEPRIVED OF HEARING OR WHO ARE THREATENED WITH DEAFNESS) IN TANZANIA, EAST AFRICA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 101
Dolphin House
Smugglers Way
LONDON
SW18 1DG
- Phone:
- 07973202956
- Email:
- tanzanear@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window