CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST (CALVARY) LIMITED

Charity number: 1061869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity was established to promote the advancement of the Christian religion and the protection and preservation of health. Its objects also include to educate and train and relieve poverty and sickness among young persons who are suffering or who have suffered a legal restriction of their liberty in any penal or correction establishment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST (CALVARY) LIMITED LOGIC (Working name)
  • CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST (CLAVARY) LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Nelson Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Rev David Hugh Roy Henry Trustee 27 February 2016
None on record
Rev Elroy Patrick Trustee 08 January 2013
None on record
David Robinsion Trustee 15 March 2012
None on record
REV HERALD HORACE GRANT Trustee 05 March 2012
None on record
Rev Winston George Spencer Trustee 17 December 2011
None on record
Rev CLEVERE FENTY Trustee
None on record
Rev MICHAEL GARDNER Trustee
None on record
Rev GLADSTONE THOMPSON Trustee
None on record
Rev GEOFFREY FOLKES FOLKES Trustee
None on record
RT REV Alvin BLAKE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.00m £910.67k £968.98k £1.05m £1.16m
Total expenditure £1.07m £807.31k £780.92k £928.48k £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £997.14k £908.90k £968.23k £1.05m £1.15m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.06k £1.77k £754 £1.23k £7.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £802.47k £779.66k £927.75k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.32k £4.84k £1.26k £725 £2.64k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £25.90k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £9.13m £10.68m £10.57m £10.45m £10.90m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.62m £1.60m £1.65m £1.86m £1.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £397.75k £765.06k £515.60k £491.99k £29.49k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 12 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CALVARY CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST
127 DUNSTABLE ROAD
LUTON
LU1 1BW
Phone:
01582 877 070
Website:

No information available