BUSY BEES CHILDCARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Child Care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £135,095 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 22 April 1997: Standard registration
- 13 March 2024: Funds received from 1061085 ST NICHOLAS PLAYGROUP (COLCHESTER STATION)
- CARVER BARRACKS CHILD CARE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Hawkey | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Browne | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Purkhardt | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amritpal Singh | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Jones | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Harrison | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Beach | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.13k | £64.35k | £98.91k | £135.10k | £199.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.43k | £70.11k | £80.13k | £117.35k | £150.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £56.61k | N/A | £101.01k | £135.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Busy Bees
Rowney Avenue Village Square
Carver Barracks
Wimbish
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
- Phone:
- 01799 523542
- Email:
- bees.busy@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window