Financial history CRESSWELL VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1064661
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2005 30/03/2006 30/03/2007 30/03/2008 30/03/2009
Total gross income £2.14k £2.23k £2.59k £2.73k £2.87k
Total expenditure £1.27k £2.10k £1.84k £2.37k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A