CENTRAL JAMIA MOSQUE MADNI AND EDUCATION CENTRE, HALIFAX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Islamic faith in the area of Halifax mainly by the establishment and maintenance of Mosques and Islamic teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 24 June 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD SULTAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ryasat Hussain | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheraz Aziz | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Rashid Chaudhray | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Riaz | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Awais Ahmed | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Boston | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Idris | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mushtaq Ahmed Mr | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
AKBAR ALI | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMAIL ISMAIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PINU KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD YOUNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AKRAM HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAL DIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAJA IQBAL KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £437.22k | £342.40k | £441.37k | £370.62k | £365.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459.03k | £324.54k | £335.40k | £360.06k | £307.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.23k | £21.44k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT SCHEME DATED 28 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1997, 24 MAY 2008 AND 30 AUGUST 2008.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE AREA OF HALIFAX WEST YORKSHIRE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
HALIFAX, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lindley Adams Ltd
28 Prescott Street
Halifax
HX1 2LG
- Phone:
- 01422358601
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window