Accounts and annual returns FOXHOLES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1092450
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 29 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 16 March 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 24 July 2022 146 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required