THE OLD ROEDEANIANS SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund was established over 90 years ago to assist present pupils who have been at the School for at least two years, Old Roedeanians and their daughters, granddaughters and great-granddaughters. There is a preference for pupils at the School who are studying at Sixth Form level. The Award is means-tested, and Award holders are selected by the School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Sussex
Governance
- 03 December 1997: Standard registration
- OLD ROEDEANIANS' ASSOCIATION SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robina Coker | Chair | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Henderson | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Laura Challen | Trustee | 11 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | £14.90k | £6.15k | £4.50k | £6.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93k | £4.58k | £10.48k | £12.36k | £10.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 27TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PURPOSES OF PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING ) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND; (A) ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AS A PUPIL AT ROEDEAN SCHOOL, BRIGHTON, IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX (THE SCHOOL), OR (B) ARE CHILDREN, GRANDCHILDREN OR GREAT GRANDCHILDREN OF A FORMER PUPIL OF THE SCHOOL WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL WHO ARE STUDYING AT SIXTH FORM LEVEL AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING- (1) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; (11) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. WITHIN THE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY THIS SCHEME THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE FULL POWER TO MAKE RULES FOR THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES AND OTHER BENEFITS, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE AWARDS AND QUALIFICATIONS, METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION OF CANDIDATES FOR BENEFIT. (2) IF THE TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE TO APPLY ALL OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE ABOVE-MENTIONED PURPOSES IN ANY ONE YEAR THEY MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR THE SAME PURPOSES IN THE FOLLOWING YEAR.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 E
Cambridge Street
Pimlico
London
SW1V 4PY
- Phone:
- 07816918873
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window