Steps Conductive Education Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Steps provides: A unique service using the principles of Conductive Education for children with conditions that cause motor impairments or motor delay such as Cerebral Palsy or Down's Syndrome. Steps also offer support for children attending mainstream school in the form of a gym club. Support is given to the whole family by providing parents with the knowledge they need to understand their child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 30 June 1997: Standard registration
- STEPS (Working name)
- CHARNWOOD SCHOOL FOR PARENTS (Previous name)
- STEPS - LEICESTERSHIRE CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JOSEPH MONTAGUE | Chair |
|
||||||
SIMON WINFIELD | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|||||
David Michael Andrews DL | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Angela Isabela Agnes Lennox CBE DL | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Elizabeth Cooper-Hudson | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Beales | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JEAN NEIL Rimmington CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY CARR B.ENG HONS. C. ENG, MIET | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.28k | £306.34k | £204.40k | £244.34k | £262.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.52k | £230.52k | £240.02k | £256.01k | £243.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.46k | £61.90k | £6.84k | N/A | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 MAY 1997 AS VARIED 19 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 25 MARCH 2003, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 20 AUGUST 2008 as amended on 29 Oct 2019 as amended on 24 Feb 2021 as amended on 04 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
1)TO PROVIDE CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN UNDER 5 WHO HAVE CEREBRAL PALSY OR ALLIED CONDITIONS, WHO WILL NORMALLY BE ACCOMPANIED BY PARENTS/CARERS 2) TO PROVIDE APPROPRIATE ONGOING SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN OVER 5 WHO HAVE CEREBRAL PALSY, INCLUDING AN ANNUAL SUMMERSCHOOL 3) TO PROVIDE APPROPRIATE ONGOING SUPPORT FOR PARENTS AND CHILDREN WITH WHATEVER THE ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS ARE, AND IN ADDITION THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND INFORMATION. 4)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION WITH THE STATUTORY BODIES, HEALTH, EDUCATION AND SOCIAL SERVICES, IN THE COUNTY.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE AND ACCESSIBLE AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School
40 Loughborough Road
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 9DN
- Phone:
- 01509506878
- Email:
- info@stepscentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window