Accounts and annual returns WHEELOCK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1063636
Charity reporting is overdue by 1713 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 983 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 983 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1348 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1348 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1713 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1713 days