LYMPHOMA LEUKAEMIA MYELOMA FUND (WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to promote the work of the Haematology unit at Swansea NHS Trust, and related institutions in Wales, in the support of patients and their families diagnosed with blood cancer diseases e.g. Lymphoma, Leukaemia and Multiple Myeloma. This includes the purchase of equipment not normally provided by the NHS. Also to promote research and disseminate information related to blood cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
- Pembrokeshire
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 15 August 1997: Standard registration
- LLF (Working name)
- LLF (WALES) (Working name)
- LYMPHOMA AND LEUKAEMIA FUND (WALES) (Previous name)
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Shreeve | Chair | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Chilcott | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Christopher Hughes | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thomas | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.89k | £18.79k | £21.81k | £15.63k | £35.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.68k | £4.85k | £1.55k | £1.38k | £9.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 4 AUGUST 1997 AND 19 JULY 2010. as amended on 28 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN WALES SUFFERING FROM LYMPHOMA AND LEUKAEMIA AND ASSOCIATED BLOOD DISEASES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND SUCH COMFORTS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AT THE BONE MARROW TRANSPLANT UNIT OF THE HAEMATOLOGY DEPARTMENT AT SINGLETON HOSPITAL, SWANSEA 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATION INTO LYMPHOMA AND LEUKAEMIA AND ASSOCIATED BLOOD DISEASES
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merrysun
Oxwich
SWANSEA
SA3 1LN
- Phone:
- 07905677505
- Email:
- llmfwales@gmail.com
- Website:
-
llmf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window