Accounts and annual returns ENFIELD HOMESTART

Charity number: 1062412
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 May 2018 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 May 2018 464 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 May 2018 464 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 10 May 2018 830 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 10 May 2018 830 days late