FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Andrew's Church belongs to all of Farnham - both those who live and work in the town. For over 1000 years it has served and been served by its people. The Parish Church rises in the very centre of Farnham - an outstandingly beautiful building and open to all. The Friends of St. Andrew's seek to conserve the building for future generations and to encourange its use by the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 July 1997: Standard registration
- FOSTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER FOX | Trustee | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA POWELL | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brian Martin | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diana Martin | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL BLOWER MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINA AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.72k | £1.81k | £2.57k | £2.89k | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.33k | £97 | £1.03k | £1.25k | £1.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 December 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 December 2024 | 420 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 03/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND CONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST ANDREW'S ,ITS MONUMENTS AND FIXTURES, FITTING, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Greenhills
Greenhill Road
FARNHAM
GU9 8LD
- Phone:
- 01252716170
- Email:
- BEMDEM35@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window