THE ON YER BIKE TRUST OF KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 11 February 1998: Standard registration
- 04 July 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY IN NEED, THE DISABLED AND THOSE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES BY THE PROMOTION OF CYCLING AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALLY ADAPTED BICYCLES AND THE PHYSICALLY POWERED VEHICLES.
Area of benefit
KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window