SOUTH BRISTOL CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities enabling dysfunctional families to allow a parent with custody of children to bring them to meet the parent without custody.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 13 October 1997: Standard registration
- 15 April 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- SBCCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.06k | £2.74k | £2.63k | £13.72k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.47k | £5.74k | £6.60k | £3.50k | £3.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 April 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 1997, AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE EMOTIONAL DISTRESS CAUSED TO CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF AVON OR SUCCESSORS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE BREAK UP OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN
Area of benefit
FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window