HELP IN BEREAVEMENT

Charity Number: 1062269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Visiting bereaved people to offer support and help.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £478
Total expenditure: £934

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Portsmouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 1997: Standard registration
  • 19 January 2022: Funds received from 801028 THE PORTSMOUTH LIONS CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Elizabeth Sissons Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Josephine Mary McGibben Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
Heather Caruth Trustee 17 February 2015
None on record
Janet Chalk Trustee 17 February 2015
None on record
SANDRA SIMMONDS Trustee 17 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.00k £4.07k £485 £130 £478
Total expenditure £2.81k £904 £903 £897 £934
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2024 348 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10A BINNESS WAY
PORTSMOUTH
PO6 1LD
Phone:
07931334680