Financial history THE VENIK TRUST

Charity number: 1063185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £119.44k £115.03k £93.07k £145.29k £173.18k
Total expenditure £39.78k £113.11k £187.79k £101.29k £59.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A