EARTHWORKS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPERATION OF THE SUSTAINABILITY CENTRE as an independent education and learning centre Mission Statement: To demonstrate, develop and promote knowledge, skills, technologies and lifestyles that improve people's quality of life without damaging the local and global environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£504,834
Donations and legacies | £85.64k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £8.65k | |
Investments | £410.54k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£421,080
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £408.62k | |
Other | £12.46k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,100 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £12.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £408.62k | |
Retained for future use | £83.75k |
People

1 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 16 March 2000: Standard registration
- SUSTAINABILITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFF LANE | Chair | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marshall | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Victoria Ruzewicz | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Thwaites | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Janet Ruzewicz | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Wilcock | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karolina Mabel de Jonge | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Suzanne Crothers | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paddy Cox | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet McKenzie | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Ciniglio | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Richard Hillyer | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SAULET | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD MORGAN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £728.33k | £993.32k | £617.18k | £509.91k | £504.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.54k | £215.76k | £219.16k | £321.38k | £421.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £55.28k | £20.66k | £3.64k | £1.10k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £566.45k | £831.46k | £403.40k | £71.44k | £85.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.11k | £20.96k | £10.42k | £6.77k | £8.65k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £53.87k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £151.78k | £140.90k | £203.37k | £377.83k | £410.54k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £176.89k | £212.61k | £215.44k | £311.47k | £408.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £665 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.65k | £3.14k | £3.73k | £9.25k | £12.46k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £914.94k | £1.94m | £2.17m | £2.21m | £2.22m | |
|
Long-term investments | £148.09k | £154.60k | £159.11k | £91.46k | £101.57k | |
|
Other assets | £719.62k | £1.04m | £906.31k | £1.26m | £1.09m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £223.33k | £796.01k | £503.58k | £645.92k | £409.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 OCTOBER 1995 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT WAYS OF LIVING AND WORKING AND USE OF RESOURCES WHICH DO NOT DAMAGE THE LOCAL OR GLOBAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE IMPROVEMENT, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE LOCAL OR GLOBAL ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SUSTAINABILITY CENTRE
DROXFORD ROAD
EAST MEON
PETERSFIELD
HAMPSHIRE
GU32 1HR
- Phone:
- 01730823166
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window