Trustees EARTHWORKS TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1079866

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFF LANE | Chair | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marshall | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Victoria Ruzewicz | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Thwaites | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Janet Ruzewicz | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Wilcock | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karolina Mabel de Jonge | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Suzanne Crothers | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paddy Cox | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet McKenzie | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Ciniglio | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Richard Hillyer | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SAULET | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD MORGAN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.