THE OESOPHAGEAL PATIENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity produces approved quality information booklets for patients diagnosed with oesophageal or gastric cancer in hospitals around the UK. Meetings are arranged at which patients and carers meet others and which medical staff also attend. No charges are made and fundraising events are organised. A telephone helpline is provided. The patient voice is encouraged on medical committees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 May 1997: Standard registration
- 18 August 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 18 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1194327 OPA Cancer Charity
- OPA (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.60k | £183.57k | £199.60k | £187.91k | £264.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.22k | £172.50k | £145.58k | £139.88k | £150.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/04/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ALLEVIATE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OF ANY PERSONS AFFECTED IN ANY WAY BY THE RELEVANT CONDITIONS AND TREATMENTS 2) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION TO THOSE AFFECTED, AND TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, ABOUT THE RELEVANT CONDITIONS AND TREATMENTS 3) TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, COLLABORATE WITH, AND PROVIDING FUNDING FOR RESEARCH PROJECTS ASSOCIATED WITH RELEVANT CONDITIONS AND TREATMENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window