SOS CHILDREN'S VILLAGES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity exists to help orphans, vulnerable children and children at risk of abandonment to lead a full life by providing a home, a family and a mother by way of our SOS villages or a family strengthening programme. We also provide education and medical care for a much larger group and emergency relief when required (given that we are present in 132 countries worldwide).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£5,421,374
Donations and legacies | £5.20m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £137.24k | |
Investments | £80.31k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,348,238
Raising funds | £2.04m | |
Charitable activities | £6.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£50,522 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.04m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.31m |
People

26 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Albania
- Algeria
- Angola
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Belarus
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Djibouti
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Lithuania
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- SOS CHILDREN (Working name)
- WORLD ORPHAN WEEK (Working name)
- WOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Annette Bowden | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suli Ulla Anja Hampson | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary McDonald | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Steinback | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Reilly | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adelise Baha | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harpinder Collacott | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Solava Samir Saad Mohamed Ibrahim | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Briggs | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.56m | £4.27m | £7.85m | £8.44m | £5.42m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.05m | £4.96m | £5.23m | £7.04m | £8.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.54m | £4.24m | £7.80m | £8.14m | £5.20m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.07k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £137.24k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.60m | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.00k | £5.00k | £1.00k | £287.48k | £80.31k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £17.51k | £50.08k | £18.94k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £779.51k | £337.42k | £2.77m | £1.85m | £276.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.64m | £3.89m | £3.74m | £4.43m | £6.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.41m | £1.07m | £1.48m | £2.61m | £2.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £102.85k | £129.89k | £169.23k | £0 | £190.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £819.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.62k | £20.74k | £142.14k | £1.24m | £279.37k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.21m | £1.10m | £1.25m | £293.53k | £1.28m | |
|
Other assets | £3.58m | £2.83m | £5.20m | £6.55m | £3.76m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.31m | £1.26m | £1.13m | £1.25m | £1.35m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 APR 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 DEC 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 SEP 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 FEB 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF VULNERABLE CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (I) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD OF SOS CHILDREN'S VILLAGES AND (II) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS FROM SOS CHILDREN'S VILLAGES.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOS CHILDREN'S VILLAGES UK
RAVENSCROFT HOUSE
59 Regent Street
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1AB
- Phone:
- 01223365589
- Email:
- hello@sosuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window