BEACONSFIELD READING ROOMS, LIBRARY AND INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of Property for the education and the provision of recreational facilities in the interests of social welfare for the benefit of the inhabitants of Beaconsfield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 27 October 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Elisabeth Adali | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 27 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
THE HON. JENEFER FARNCOMBE | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA CRAWFORD | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY CRAWFORD | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR PIKE | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.27k | £17.54k | £3.48k | £19.99k | £16.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.56k | £6.18k | £56.84k | £7.26k | £7.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 May 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 22 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEACONSFIELD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT ") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL , RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Crabtree Close
BEACONSFIELD
Buckinghamshire
HP9 1UQ
- Phone:
- 01494677386
- Email:
- pamcrawford5@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window