'GIFTS FOR ROMANIA'

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gifts For Romania is a christian charity that operates in the South-West of the country, though not limited to that area, and works in supporting religious activities, education and health amongst the Roma people of that area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Romania
Governance
- 22 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAY GILES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Wiggins | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENISE SUE GILES | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev CAROLINE Beckett | Trustee | 19 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WHITESIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE WHITESIDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £3.94k | £5.26k | £4.27k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.16k | £3.89k | £5.29k | £4.14k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED ON 6 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS IN THE COUNTRY OF ROMANIA IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY THE SUPPLY AND TRANSPORT OF HUMANITARIAN AID. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Coach Road
Alresford
COLCHESTER
CO7 8EB
- Phone:
- 01206 826607
- Email:
- raynsue.giles@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
giftsforromania.blogspot.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window