Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BANGLADESH CENTRE

Charity Number: 1064788
Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 July 2022 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required