TOWER OF FAITH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The enhancement of the christian faith in the united kingdom and abroad. Outreach program to help Christians and people form all walks of life in the provision of aid and support for accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
Governance
- 21 August 1997: Standard registration
- TOWER OF FAITH CHAPEL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ALFRED ANSONG BIMPONG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE ANSONG-BIMPONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Pastor ANDREW BIMPONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JOYCE BIMPONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.99k | £56.31k | £68.35k | £67.68k | £77.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.91k | £55.17k | £60.02k | £66.33k | £81.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 28TH JULY 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO SPREAD THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AS REVEALED THROUGH THE HOLY SCRIPTURE BY ALL MEANS COMMUNICATIONS, WHETHER VISUAL, VERBAL AND WRITTEN. (2) TO OR FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Park Royal Road
London
NW10 7LN
- Phone:
- 02088380114
- Email:
- admin@toweroffaith.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window