MOLDOVA AID PROJECT
Charity number: 1063339
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are sending aid to a children's hospital in Moldova.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
- Moldova
Governance
Registration history:
- 08 July 1997: Standard registration
- 31 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- MAP (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN CONCERN FOR MOLDOVA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £1 | £209 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.62k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 11 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE BY CHARITABLE MEANS TO ORPHANAGES, HOSPITALS AND CHILDREN'S HOMES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MOLDOVA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window