Rex Cinema Wareham

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To increase knowledge of and interest in film by offering a mixed programme of both commercial and non commercial film, including arthouse, foreign and classics, in the Purbeck area including local rural communities. To encourage development of skills in film making by running workshops for young people and by offering screening opportunities for young film makers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 March 2001: Standard registration
- PURBECK FILM CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE PURBECK FILM FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Lesley Woolley | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Charles Rowland | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA BRYAN | Trustee | 18 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
NEILL CHILD | Trustee | 18 May 2005 |
|
|
||||
CAROL SHARPE | Trustee | 13 January 1999 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Valentine Evans | Trustee | 13 January 1999 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.28k | £147.74k | £147.45k | £139.54k | £223.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.82k | £169.66k | £140.99k | £152.19k | £177.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | £10.95k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 JANUARY 2001 as amended on 12 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN THE RURAL AREAS OF THE COUNTY OF DORSET, IN THE ART OF CINEMATOGRAPHY
Area of benefit
THE RURAL AREAS OF THE COUNTY OF DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rex Cinema
14 West Street
WAREHAM
Dorset
BH20 4JX
- Phone:
- 01929554906
- Email:
- info@therex.co.uk
- Website:
-
therex.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window