LADY MCADDEN BREAST CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving and promoting the good health of the female population by providing facilities for searching for serious diseases
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 07 May 1997: Standard registration
- BUST (Working name)
- LADY MCADDEN'S APPEAL IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE SOUTH EAST ESSEX FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS (Previous name)
- LADY MCADDEN'S BREAST CANCER TRUST (Previous name)
- LADY MCADDEN'S BREAST SCREENING TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Linda Nichols | Chair | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Williams | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Gloyne | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Belton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wyatt | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marston | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Jones | Trustee | 22 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £502.92k | £240.98k | £240.98k | £217.76k | £317.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £526.07k | £244.18k | £244.18k | £222.77k | £255.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.43k | £92.83k | £28.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £55.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £247.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £163.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £35.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £391.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £134.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £747 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/12/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/01/2013 as amended on 04 Mar 2020 as amended on 04 Mar 2020 as amended on 27 May 2021
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following so far only as the same are legally charitable. 4.1 Preserving and promoting the good health of the population by providing facilities for searching for serious diseases by means of clinical examination, x-rays, mammography, cytological, biochemical examination, and whatsoever other methods shall from time be considered appropriate by the directors and by assessing the results of such screening and by providing analyses of the overall results and other statistical data to organisations concerned with health or to such other bodies as the directors shall from time to time consider appropriate. 4.2 Assisting towards the relief of ill health of the population by such screening and assessment and provisions of analyses and date as aforesaid 4.3 providing advice, counselling and treatment in relation to such screening and assessment as aforesaid 4.4 at the sole discretion of the directors promoting the work carried on by other organisations having objects similar to the foregoing objects of the charity
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, NORTH THAMES AREA OF ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lady McAdden Centre
203 Elmsleigh Drive
LEIGH-ON-SEA
Essex
SS9 4JH
- Phone:
- 01702343288
- Email:
- info@ladymcadden.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window