Governing document LADY MCADDEN BREAST CANCER TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/12/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/01/2013 as amended on 04 Mar 2020 as amended on 04 Mar 2020 as amended on 27 May 2021
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following so far only as the same are legally charitable. 4.1 Preserving and promoting the good health of the population by providing facilities for searching for serious diseases by means of clinical examination, x-rays, mammography, cytological, biochemical examination, and whatsoever other methods shall from time be considered appropriate by the directors and by assessing the results of such screening and by providing analyses of the overall results and other statistical data to organisations concerned with health or to such other bodies as the directors shall from time to time consider appropriate. 4.2 Assisting towards the relief of ill health of the population by such screening and assessment and provisions of analyses and date as aforesaid 4.3 providing advice, counselling and treatment in relation to such screening and assessment as aforesaid 4.4 at the sole discretion of the directors promoting the work carried on by other organisations having objects similar to the foregoing objects of the charity
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, NORTH THAMES AREA OF ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.