Trustees LADY MCADDEN BREAST CANCER TRUST
Charity number: 1062236

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Linda Nichols | Chair | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Williams | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Gloyne | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Belton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wyatt | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marston | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Jones | Trustee | 22 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.