NOAH'S ARK PRE SCHOOL (SWANTON MORLEY)

Charity number: 1062209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sponsored walk Fetes/ opendays raffles christmas play

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £148,392
Total expenditure: £148,841

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 May 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jane Flower Chair 09 March 2024
None on record
Amy Owen Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Donna Rose Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Jessica Downey Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Zoe Flint Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
JOHN DAVIES Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.79k £50.90k £98.18k £132.92k £148.39k
Total expenditure £47.06k £47.86k £96.23k £121.69k £148.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £84.11k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 March 2024 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 March 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 February 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 February 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 April 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 May 2021 100 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
QDG
Noah's Ark
Robertson Barracks
Swanton Morley
Dereham
Phone:
01362627975
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available