THE NURSES ASSOCIATION OF JAMAICA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT FUNDRAISING EVENTS TO RAISE MONEY TO SUPPORT ITS OBJECTIVE. WE HAVE EDUCATIONAL CONFERENCES, HEALTH FAIRS, CULTURAL EVENINGS AND DINNER & DANCE. WE SUPPORT COMMUNITY PROJECTS BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS. WE OFFER GRANTS AND BURSARIES TO INDIVIDUALS TO SUPPORT THEIR EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT OR COMMUNITY PROJECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 1997: Standard registration
- 20 January 2022: Funds received from 1103514 BLACK AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT GROU...
- NAJ (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARMAINE CASE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALINA WALLACE | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sherill Gregory | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LORNA GRANT | Trustee | 09 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAULETTE LEWIS MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DOROTHY TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.89k | £11.33k | £12.92k | £63.91k | £20.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.98k | £18.52k | £4.11k | £68.08k | £17.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 December 2022
(These accounts |
06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF NURSING, MIDWIFERY AND HEALTH VISITING PARTICULARLY THROUGH EDUCATION, IMPROVED STANDARDS AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 OAKWOOD ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 3QS
- Phone:
- 07950970142
- Email:
- info@naj.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window